MS HB985 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-59-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Membership Of The Emergency Medical Services Advisory Council To The State Board Of Health; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

EMS Advisory Council; revise membership of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-09 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-08SenateDied On Calendar
2023-02-28SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-02-13SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2023-02-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2023-02-09HousePassed As Amended
2023-02-09HouseAmended
2023-02-07HouseRead the Third Time
2023-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2023-01-16HouseReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
41597Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback