MS HB984 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-15-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Notice Required To Be Provided When A Special Meeting Of The Board Of Nursing Is Called; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Board of Nursing; revise the notice required for special meeting of.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-25 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-18 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-06-02 | Senate | DR - TSDP: PH To AC |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |