MS HB982 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on July 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-09 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 25-15-405, 25-15-407 And 25-15-409, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Payments For Benefits And Insurance Premiums Under The Mississippi First Responders Health And Safety Act; To Create The Mississippi First Responders Health And Safety Trust Fund; To Amend Section 83-34-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Annually Divert Forty Percent Of The Nonadmitted Policy Fee To Fund The Rural Fire Truck And Supplemental Fund, The Mississippi First Responders Health And Safety Fund, The Comprehensive Hurricane Mitigation Fund And To Provide Funds To The Fire Marshal's Office For Fire Prevention And Education, For Fire Apparatus Grants And Fire Protection Grants; To Delete The Repealer On The Section Of Law; To Amend Section 83-34-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Board Of Directors Of The Mississippi Insurance Underwriting Association; To Make The State Treasurer A Nonvoting Member; To Add The Secretary Of State As A Member Of The Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Nonadmitted policy fee; delete repealer on and revise distribution of.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 85 N: 19 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 94 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-09 | House | Died In Conference |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2020-06-29 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Michel,Kirby,Polk |
2020-06-18 | House | Conferees Named Ford (54th),Newman,Zuber |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-06-09 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: IN To AC |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-11 | House | Passed |
2020-03-11 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-03-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Insurance |