MS HB982 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-28 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Repeal Sections 63-13-1 Through 63-13-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Create The Mississippi Motor Vehicle Safety Inspection Law; To Require The Commissioner Of Public Safety To Annually Issue Permits For, And Furnish Instructions And All Necessary Forms To, Official Tint Inspection Stations For The Inspection Of Windshields And Issuance Of Labels As Required By Section 63-7-59; To Provide That A Fee Of $10.00 Shall Be Charged For Such Permits; To Authorize The Commissioner Of Public Safety To Suspend Or Revoke Permits Issued To A Station That Is Not Properly Equipped Or Conducted; To Amend Sections 63-7-59, 37-41-53 And 63-1-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Motor Vehicle Safety Inspection Law; repeal, provide for inspection of tinted windshields.
Sponsors
Rep. Stephen Horne [R] | Rep. Pat Nelson [R] | Rep. John Hines [D] | Rep. Jody Steverson [R] |
Rep. Bryant Clark [D] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] | Rep. Joey Hood [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-19 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 113 N: 7 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 44 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-12 - House - House Passed (Y: 99 N: 20 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-28 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-23 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-19 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2015-02-17 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-16 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2015-02-13 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Young, Johnson, Massengill, Frierson) |
2015-02-12 | House | Passed |
2015-02-12 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-02-03 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-02-03 | House | DR - TSDPCS: AP To TR |
2015-01-28 | House | DR - TSDPCS: TR To AP |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Transportation;Appropriations |