MS HB981 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-29 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Bring Forward Sections 27-103-125, 27-103-139, 27-103-203, 27-103-211, 27-103-213 And 27-103-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Relate To Various Aspects Of The Budget Process, For The Purposes Of Possible Amendment; To Amend Section 37-61-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Requirement To Deposit Into The Working Cash-stabilization Reserve Fund A Certain Sum From The Money Remaining In The Education Enhancement Fund After Funds Are Distributed For Educational Purposes; To Provide For Certain Transfers To The Capital Expense Fund During Fiscal Year 2019; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Budget process; bring forward various sections relating to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-29HouseDied In Conference
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Clarke,Hopson,Simmons (13th)
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Read,Cockerham,Huddleston
2019-03-12HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-07SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-06SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-06SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback