MS HB981 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 73-11-67, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That Retail Sellers Of Caskets That Sell Preneed Contracts For Caskets Shall Be Required To Meet All Of The Requirements That Are Applicable To Preneed Contracts For Funeral Services; To Amend Sections 75-63-53 And 75-63-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Provision; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Preneed casket contracts; must meet all requirements applicable to preneed contracts for funeral services.
Sponsors
Rep. Earle Banks [D] |
Roll Calls
2010-03-08 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2010-03-12 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-11 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2010-03-10 | Transmitted To House | |
2010-03-10 | Motion to Reconsider Tabled | |
2010-03-08 | Motion to Reconsider Entered | |
2010-03-08 | Passed | |
2010-03-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-02-15 | Referred To Insurance | |
2010-02-11 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2010-02-09 | Passed | |
2010-02-02 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2010-01-18 | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |