MS HB980 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 27-104-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Delete The Provision That Contractual Obligations Of State Agencies Shall Be Considered As Incurred Within The Fiscal Period In Which They Are To Be Paid, And Are To Be Encumbered Against Funds To Be Available In That Fiscal Period; To Require Approval By The Department Of Finance And Administration Before State Agencies May Pay Certain Contractual Obligations From A Prior Fiscal Year; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agencies; delete provision that contractual obligations of shall be considered as incurred in fiscal period to be paid.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18 Approved by Governor
2019-04-02SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-04-02HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-28SenateConference Report Adopted
2019-03-28HouseConference Report Adopted
2019-03-27HouseConference Report Filed
2019-03-27SenateConference Report Filed
2019-03-22SenateConferees Named Clarke,Wiggins,Frazier
2019-03-19HouseConferees Named Read,Huddleston,Denny
2019-03-12HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2019-03-07SenateReturned For Concurrence
2019-03-06SenatePassed As Amended
2019-03-06SenateAmended
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Appropriations
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/history/HB/HB0980.xml
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0980IN.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0980CS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0980PS.htm
Texthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0980SG.htm
Amendmenthttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2019/html/sam/HB0980_S_Cmte_Amend_01.htm
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0310006.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0580007.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/house/0800048.pdf
Roll Callhttp://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2019/pdf/votes/senate/0800121.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback