MS HB98 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 49-15-78, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit The Use Of A Haul Seine Net For The Taking Of Fish In Marine Waters Within One-half Mile Of The Shoreline Of Cat Island; To Provide The Definition For The Phrase "like Contrivances"; To Exempt Cast Nets, Brill Nets And Hand Seines; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Haul seine net; prohibit use of for taking of certain fish within one-half mile of the shoreline of Cat Island.
Sponsors
Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] | Rep. Shane Barnett [R] | Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. David Baria [D] |
Sen. Scott DeLano [R] | Rep. Greg Haney [R] | Rep. Randall Patterson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 112 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Referred To Ports and Marine Resources |
2019-02-15 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2019-02-13 | House | Passed As Amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Amended |
2019-02-13 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2019-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2019-01-11 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |