MS HB974 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 7 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-07 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-113, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Furanyl Fentanyl And U-47700 As Schedule I Controlled Substances; To Amend Section 41-29-115, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Dronabinol And Thiafentanil As Schedule Ii Controlled Substances; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Controlled Substances Laws; revise Schedules I and II.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 114 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-07SenateDied On Calendar
2018-02-27SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-02-27SenateDR - TSDPAA: JA To DP
2018-02-22SenateDR - TSDPAA: DP To JA
2018-02-16SenateReferred To Drug Policy;Judiciary, Division A
2018-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-07HousePassed As Amended
2018-02-07HouseAmended
2018-01-26HouseTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2018-01-12HouseReferred To Drug Policy

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback