MS HB974 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-28 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-9-127, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That From July 1, 2017, Through June 30, 2020, The Personnel Actions Of Certain Agencies Shall Be Exempt From The State Personnel Board Rules, Regulations And Procedures; To Amend Section 25-9-148, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The State Personnel Board To Submit A Monthly Electronic Report To The Chairs Of The House And Senate Appropriations Committees Regarding Increases In Compensation For State Officers And Employees During The Preceding Month; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Personnel Board; certain agencies shall be exempt from rules, regulations and procedures of for three years.
Sponsors
Rep. John Read [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-02 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 62 N: 58 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Referred To Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2017-02-08 | House | Motion to Recnsdr Tabled Lost |
2017-02-02 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Miles, Read, Huddleston (15th), Holland) |
2017-02-02 | House | Passed As Amended |
2017-02-02 | House | Amended |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Appropriations |