MS HB967 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 97-33-301, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make A Technical Correction To The Short Title Of The Fantasy Contest Act; To Amend Section 97-33-303, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Definitions; To Amend Section 97-33-305, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Requirements That Apply To Fantasy Contests; To Amend Section 97-33-307, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Licensure Of Fantasy Contest Operators; To Amend Section 97-33-309, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Penalties That Apply To Violations Of The Act; To Amend Section 97-33-311, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 97-33-313, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For Disciplinary Action; To Amend Section 97-33-315, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify The Investigative And Administrative Authority Of The Gaming Commission; To Create New Code Section 97-33-317, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Impose A Fee On Fantasy Contest Operators Who Offer Fantasy Contests In This State; To Amend Sections 75-76-5 And 75-76-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Fantasy Contest Act; revise.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. Timmy Ladner [R] | Rep. Shane Barnett [R] | Rep. Deborah Butler Dixon [D] |
Rep. Kathy Sykes [D] | Rep. Casey Eure [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 46 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Failed (Y: 65 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 92 N: 22 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Failed (Y: 65 N: 53 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2017-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-09 | House | Passed |
2017-02-09 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-02-08 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (DeLano, Bennett, Ladner) |
2017-02-08 | House | Failed |
2017-02-08 | House | Amendment Failed |
2017-02-02 | House | Set Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair |
2017-02-02 | House | Point of Order Raised |
2017-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Gaming |