MS HB963 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 31-19-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For The Advertisement Of The Sale And Receipt Of Bids For The Sale Of Bonds By The Governing Authority Of Any County, Road District, School District, Drainage District Or Other Political Subdivision Or Instrumentality Of This State, To Provide That Sealed Bids May Be Submitted In Electronic Form; To Require That A Successful Bidder At Such A Sale Must, No Later Than Noon On The Next Business Day Following The Sale Of The Bonds, Submit A Good Faith Deposit To The Proper Governing Authority As A Guaranty That The Bidder Will Carry Out His Contract To Purchase The Bonds; To Provide That A Good Faith Deposit May Be Submitted By Wire Transfer; To Provide That If A Successful Bidder Fails To Timely Submit A Good Faith Deposit, The Governing Authority May Sell The Bonds By Private Sale At Any Time Within Sixty Days After The Date Advertised For The Reception Of Bids, But That No Such Private Sale May Be Made At A Price Less Than The Next Highest Bid That Was Received Pursuant To Such Advertisement; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonds; revise certain provisions regarding sale by political subdivisions and other instrumentalities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-20SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-07HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback