MS HB962 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 93-16-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Requirements For Grandparent Visitation Petitions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Grandparent visitation; revise requirements to file petition.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-07 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-16 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2018-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-07 | House | Passed |
2018-02-07 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-12 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |