MS HB96 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-29 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-15-201 And 43-15-207, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Definitions Under The Baby Drop-off Law; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Baby Drop-off Law; revise.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-29 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-22 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-17 | House | Concurred in Amend From Senate |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-10 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred To Public Health and Human Services |