MS HB958 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 2 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit School District Personnel From Engaging In Political Activity While In Performance Of Official Duties And Responsibilities; To Prohibit The Use Of District Time, Property, Equipment, Supplies Or Personnel To Produce, Distribute, Disseminate, Circulate Or Communicate Any Material Or Information In Support Or Opposition Of Political Activity; To Prohibit Soliciting Or Attempts To Solicit Funds From School District Personnel On Behalf Of A Political Activity; To Prohibit Political Activity On School Property; To Provide That Any Limitation Imposed On District Personnel Engaging In Political Activity Shall Not Be Applicable To Such Person On Their Personal Time; To Require School Superintendents And School Board Members To Remain Neutral By Not Engaging In Political Activities On School Property And By Not Publicly Supporting Or Opposing Any Political Party; To Prescribe Penalties For Violations Of This Act; To Bring Forward Sections 23-15-801, 23-15-871 And 23-15-873, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School personnel; prohibit from engaging in political activity while in performance of official duties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Died In Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Education |