MS HB957 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-10 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 83-17-407 And 83-17-417, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide The Commissioner Of Insurance With A Licensure Waiver And Exemption For Certain Adjuster License Applicants; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Insurance adjusters; revise licensing laws regarding.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Chism [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-07 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Passed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred To Insurance |
2017-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2017-02-08 | House | Passed |
2017-02-08 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2017-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Insurance |