MS HB948 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Reenact And Amend Section 83-34-4, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Monies Derived From The Nonadmitted Policy Fee To Be Deposited Into The Rural Fire Truck Fund Or Supplementary Rural Fire Truck Fund And To Extend The Repealer Thereon; To Amend Section 83-34-35, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Association To Obtain Approval From The Commissioner Before Obtaining Reinsurance Greater Than The Probable Maximum Loss For A Storm Expected To Occur Every One Hundred Fifty Years, And To Require Any Purchase Of Reinsurance To Include At A Minimum A Self-insured Retention Of One Hundred Million Dollars; To Require The Commissioner Of Insurance To Submit A Study Of The Association To The Legislature; To Amend Section 83-21-21, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform; To Amend Section 17-23-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Additional Round For The Rural Fire Truck Acquisition Assistance Program; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Windstorm Underwriting Association; revise various provisions relating to.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 92 N: 23 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency;Finance |
2018-02-08 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-02-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2018-02-06 | House | Amended |
2018-02-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2018-01-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Insurance |