MS HB945 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-16-11, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Employment Opportunities For Special Needs Students Who Fully Meet The Requirements Of And Qualify For An Occupational Diploma Upon Graduation; To Require The Local School District To Automatically Submit The Names Of Those Individuals To The Local Win Job Center For Entry Into A Centralized Database System That Operates As A Placement Component For Employment With A Local Or State Governmental Entity; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Occupational diploma; revise manner of issuance to increase employment opportunities for students with special needs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | House | Died On Calendar |
2013-02-13 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2013-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Education |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2013/pdf/history/HB/HB0945.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2013/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0945IN.htm |