MS HB924 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-26 - Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Council On Combating Obesity In Mississippi And Provide For The Members Of The Council; To Direct The Council To Develop A Comprehensive, Strategic Plan To Combat Obesity In Mississippi, Which Must Address Certain Issues; To Provide That Members Of The Council Will Serve Without Compensation For Their Services, And The Council Will Perform Its Duties Without Legislative Appropriation Or The Use Of Any State Funds; To Require The Council To Prepare And Present An Annual Report Of Its Work To The Legislature And The Governor; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Council on Combating Obesity in Mississippi; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-03-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 112 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 90 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-04-26 Vetoed
2011-04-04 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-04-01 Enrolled Bill Signed
2011-03-28 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-28 Conference Report Adopted
2011-03-27 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-27 Conference Report Filed
2011-03-24 Conferees Named Bryan,Hewes,Horhn
2011-03-17 Conferees Named Holland,Scott,Hines
2011-03-15 Decline to Concur/Invite Conf
2011-03-11 Returned For Concurrence
2011-03-09 Passed As Amended
2011-03-09 Amended
2011-02-28 Title Suff Do Pass As Amended
2011-02-11 Referred To Public Health and Welfare
2011-02-10 Transmitted To Senate
2011-02-08 Passed
2011-02-08 Committee Substitute Adopted
2011-02-01 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2011-01-17 Referred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback