MS HB917 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 77-3-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Remove The Ability Of The Public Service Commission To Regulate The Rates Of Utilities, Including Electric Power Associations, When More Than One Of Such Utilities And Associations Operate Within A Municipality; To Amend Section 77-3-5, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Public Service Commission; remove ability to regulate rates of certain utilities and cooperatives that operate within municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-11 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-05 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2013-02-15 | Senate | Referred To Energy |
2013-02-13 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2013-02-11 | House | Passed As Amended |
2013-02-11 | House | Amended |
2013-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2013-01-21 | House | Referred To Public Utilities |