MS HB915 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-02-12 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create New Section 5-1-87, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Members Of The Legislature To Have One Or More Links To Websites That Contain Information Related To Bills That They Have Introduced Placed On The Mississippi Legislature's Bill Status Website; To Provide That The Legislative Peer Committee Staff Shall Categorize The Information On The Websites To Which The Links Refer As "evidence Based," "research Based" "promising Practice," Or, In The Case Of Program Proposals That Are Not Intervention Programs, As To Standing As A "best Practice," And The Legislature's Information Technology Staff Shall Place The Links And The Categorization Of The Information On The Legislature's Bill Status Website; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Legislature's bill status website; authorize members to have website links to info about their introduced bills placed on.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-12 | House | Died On Calendar |
2015-02-12 | House | Tabled Subject To Call |
2015-02-11 | House | Read the Third Time |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2015/pdf/history/HB/HB0915.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2015/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0915IN.htm |