MS HB914 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 19 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 23-15-283, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Prohibit Changes To Precinct Boundaries Until The Legislature Completes Its Redistricting Plan For The House Of Representatives And Senate Districts; To Amend Sections 23-15-281 And 23-15-285, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Make Technical Changes; To Amend Section 19-3-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Provisions Of This Act; To Bring Forward Sections 21-8-7, 21-9-15 And 23-15-39, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Precinct boundaries; prohibit altering for certain time of.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - House - House Passed (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-19 Approved by Governor
2019-03-14SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-13HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2019-03-12SenateReturned For Enrolling
2019-03-11SenatePassed
2019-03-05SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-03-04SenateDR - TSDP: EL To AC
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Elections;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2019-02-12HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-11HousePassed
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Apportionment and Elections

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback