MS HB911 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-11 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 71-5-353, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Mississippi Works Fund In The Mississippi Employment Security Law; To Provide That Contributions To Such Fund Shall Be Made In Calendar Years 2015 And 2016 And To Provide The Amount Of Contributions And The Payment Of Contributions To Such Fund; To Establish The Contribution Rate For Calendar Years 2015 And 2016; To Provide That Mississippi Works Funds Shall Be Transferred To A Treasury Fund For The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security; To Provide That All Funds Deposited Into The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security Treasury Fund From The Mississippi Works Contributions Shall Be Allocated Exclusively By The Mississippi Department Of Employment Security To Make Strategic And Targeted Investments In The Mississippi Workforce To Encourage The Growth Of Better Paying, Higher Skilled In-demand Jobs, With A Focus On High Growth Industries, Supplying Training Funds To Meet Immediate Training Needs; To Amend Section 71-5-355, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That The General Experience Rate For Rate Years 2015 And 2016 Shall Be Zero; To Provide For An Increase In The General Experience Rate In 2015 And 2016 Under Certain Circumstances; To Amend Section 71-5-453, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; To Amend Section 37-153-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Membership Of The State Workforce Investment Board; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Employment Security Law; create the Mississippi Works Fund to provide strategic workforce training needs.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeffrey Smith [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-11 | Senate | Died On Calendar |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2015-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed |
2015-02-10 | House | Amendment Failed |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-02-02 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Workforce Development |