MS HB910 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-23 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create The Infant Mortality Reduction Collaborative And Provide For Its Membership; To Provide That The Collaborative Shall Be Assigned To The State Department Of Health For Administrative Purposes; To Provide That The Collaborative Shall Annually Make Policy Recommendations To The Legislature And Recommendations For Regulatory Changes To State Agencies On The Following Matters: Insuring The Availability, Accessibility And Affordability Of A Hormonal Supplement That Is Used To Prevent Preterm Deliveries In Pregnant Women, Insuring Access To Preconception Health Care, Reducing The Number Of Early Elective Deliveries, And The Development Of Perinatal Regions Of Care; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Infant Mortality Reduction Collaborative; create.
Sponsors
Rep. Toby Barker [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-23 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-30 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-30 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Kirby,Burton,Bryan |
2015-03-25 | House | Conferees Named Howell,Barker,Mayo |
2015-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Public Health and Welfare |
2015-02-12 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-10 | House | Passed |
2015-02-10 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2015-01-30 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Medicaid |