MS HB905 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-09 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-37-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Uniform Accounting System Prescribed By The State Department Of Education For All School Districts To Include A Method To Keep Records Of All Local, State And Federal Funds; To Amend Section 37-61-29, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Transfer The Authority To Conduct Financial Audits On School Districts From The State Department Of Audit To The State Department Of Education; And For Related Purposes.
Title
School districts; require uniform accounting system to address local, state and federal funds and transfer audit powers to SDE.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Died On Calendar |
2017-02-08 | House | Read the Third Time |
2017-01-31 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-16 | House | Referred To Education |
Mississippi State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/2017/pdf/history/HB/HB0905.xml |
Text | https://billstatus.ls.state.ms.us/documents/2017/html/HB/0900-0999/HB0905IN.htm |