MS HB90 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 31-11-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Finance And Administration To Transfer Up To One Million Dollars Of Available Bond Funds To Community Colleges Requesting To Be Exempt From Department Oversights Of Certain Repair, Renovations And Improvements To Existing Facilities Owned By Community Colleges; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community or junior colleges; authorize to administer construction contracts of $1,000,000.00 or less, and exempt certain oversight.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-12 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2020-01-24 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges |