MS HB896 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 27 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-27 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 25-15-15, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealer On The Requirement That The State Of Mississippi Pay Certain Amounts Toward The Cost Of The State And School Employees Health Insurance Plan; And For Related Purposes.
Title
State and School Employees Health Insurance Plan; extend repealer on requirement that state pay certain amounts toward cost of.
Sponsors
Rep. Jason White [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-27 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2018-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Insurance;Appropriations |
2018-01-26 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed |
2018-01-24 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2018-01-11 | House | Referred To Appropriations |