MS HB891 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 31 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-31 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Repeal The Common Law Rule Against Perpetuities; To Suspend The Power Of Alienation; To Provide General And Nongeneral Powers Of Appointment; To Provide For The Treatment Of Assets Upon Expiration Of A Trust Term; To Provide A Savings Provision; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Rule against perpetuities; revise with respect to certain trusts.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 119 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-31 | House | Died In Conference |
2014-03-27 | Senate | Conferees Named Hopson,Doty,Longwitz |
2014-03-13 | House | Conferees Named Baker,Reynolds,Lamar |
2014-03-10 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Amended |
2014-02-25 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2014-02-14 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division A |
2014-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed |
2014-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Judiciary A |