MS HB884 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on June 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-09 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 27-65-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Portion Of The Sales Tax Revenue Collected On Business Activities On The Premises Of A Mississippi State Park Shall Be Deposited Into The State Parks Repair, Renovation And Capital Improvements Fund; To Amend Section 55-3-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The "state Parks Repair, Renovation And Capital Improvements Fund" As A Special Fund In The State Treasury; To Provide That Monies In The Fund Shall Be Expended, Upon Appropriation By The Legislature, To Defray The Costs Of Repairs, Renovations And Capital Improvements At Mississippi State Parks; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Sales tax; divert certain sales tax revenue to special fund for state parks improvement.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Bounds [R] | Rep. Tom Miles [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 5 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-09 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-14 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |