MS HB884 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-13 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Board Of Trustees Of State Institutions Of Higher Learning, Acting On Behalf Of Mississippi State University Of Agriculture And Applied Sciences, To Enter Into Lease And Sublease Of Property Located Thereon For The Purpose Of Developing Housing And Retail Space To Benefit The University; To Provide That The Term Of Such Leases Shall Not Exceed 40 Years And One Additional Option For A Renewal Period Not To Exceed Ten Years; To Provide That Leases Or Subleases Entered Into By The Board Shall Be Protected From Actions Of Successor Boards Based On The Binding Successor Doctrine; And For Related Purposes.
Title
MSU; authorize to enter into a long term lease for housing and retail purposes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-19 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-01 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 122 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-13 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-26 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-18 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2016-04-17 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-17 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2016-04-16 | Senate | Conferees Named Blount,Harkins,Dearing |
2016-04-13 | House | Conferees Named Weathersby,Sullivan,Mettetal |
2016-03-30 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2016-03-28 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Amended |
2016-03-17 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2016-03-11 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |
2016-03-03 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2016-03-01 | House | Passed As Amended |
2016-03-01 | House | Amended |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2016-02-25 | House | Read the Third Time |
2016-02-23 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2016-02-08 | House | Referred To Public Property |