MS HB884 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Failed on March 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-03 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Enact The "cat Island Land Consolidation And Exchange Act"; To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Negotiate With The United States Of America And Its Agencies, Including The National Park Service, For An In-kind Exchange Of Lands On Cat Island For Purposes Of Consolidating Into Contiguous Tracts The Holdings Of The State Of Mississippi And The United States Of America On Cat Island; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Cat Island; authorize the Sec. of State to negotiate with the U.S. government for consolidation of lands located on through exchange.
Sponsors
Rep. Casey Eure [R] | Rep. Richard Bennett [R] | Rep. David Baria [D] | Rep. Patricia Willis [R] |
Rep. Carolyn Crawford [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-03 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2015-03-02 | Senate | DR - TSDPAA: PP To AP |
2015-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Public Property;Appropriations |
2015-02-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-02-05 | House | Passed |
2015-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Marine Resources |