MS HB883 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 37-29-65, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide For The Revised Composition Of The Boards Of Trustees For The Northeast Mississippi Community College District And The Coahoma Community College District To Represent The Boards' Make Up As It Existed Before July 1, 2019; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Community College Boards of Trustees; revise composition of Northeast Mississippi and Coahoma Community Colleges.
Sponsors
Rep. Nick Bain [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-08 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Referred To Universities and Colleges |
2022-02-10 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-09 | House | Motion to Reconsider Tabled |
2022-02-08 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Rosebud, Huddleston, Scoggin) |
2022-02-08 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-08 | House | Amended |
2022-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Universities and Colleges |