MS HB883 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Failed on March 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-02 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Prohibit Any State Or Local Agency That Employs Peace Officers Or Parking Enforcement Employees From Establishing Any Policy Requiring Any Such Officers Or Employees To Meet An Arrest Quota Concerning Traffic Violations; To Prohibit The Number Of Arrests Or Citations Issued By A Peace Officer Or Parking Enforcement Employee As The Sole Criterion For Earning Any Benefit Provided By A State Or Local Agency; To Provide Certain Definitions; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Traffic ticket quotas; prohibit state and local agencies from establishing.
Sponsors
Rep. Rickey Thompson [D] | Rep. Dana Criswell [R] | Rep. Shane Barnett [R] | Rep. Steve Hopkins [R] |
Rep. Brady Williamson [R] | Rep. Chris Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-10 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-02 | Senate | Died In Committee |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Referred To Judiciary, Division B |
2021-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2021-02-10 | House | Passed |
2021-01-28 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2021-01-18 | House | Referred To Judiciary B |