MS HB867 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-02-14 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 41-29-139, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Add Penalties For Possession Of Heroin Or Fentanyl And Possession With Intent To Transfer Heroin Or Fentanyl, To The Provisions Of Law That Provide Penalties For Possession And Sell Of All Prohibited Controlled Substances; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Heroin and fentanyl; add penalties for possession, or death resulting from use of.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-14HouseDied On Calendar
2019-02-12HouseTabled Subject To Call
2019-02-12HousePoint of Order-Not Well Taken
2019-02-07HouseSet Aside-Pend Ruling of Chair
2019-02-07HousePoint of Order Raised
2019-02-07HouseAmended
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-31HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Judiciary A

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback