MS HB863 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-25 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 27-35-301, 27-35-303, 27-35-305, 27-35-309, 27-35-311, 27-35-313 And 27-35-325, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding The Assessment Of Railroad And Other Public Service Corporation Property For The Purposes Of Ad Valorem Taxation; To Revise The Date By Which Railroads And Other Public Service Corporations Must File With The Department Of Revenue For Ad Valorem Tax Assessment Purposes Schedules Of Property Owned By Such Corporations; To Revise The Time For Which The Department Of Revenue May Grant An Extension For The Filing Of Such Schedules; To Revise The Length Of Time That Assessments Made By The Department Of Revenue Of Such Property Shall Remain Open For Objection; To Revise The Date By Which Railroads And Other Public Service Corporations Must File An Apportionment Of The Assessed Value Of Property Of Such Corporations; To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding Objections To Assessments Made By The Department Of Revenue; To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding The Imposition Of A Penalty Against Railroads Or Other Public Service Corporations For Failure To File The Required Schedules Of Property For Ad Valorem Tax Assessment Purposes; To Amend Section 27-35-513, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise Certain Provisions Regarding The Imposition Of A Penalty Against Railroad Car Companies For Failure To File Required Statements With The Department Of Revenue For Ad Valorem Tax Assessment Purposes; To Amend Section 27-35-703, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Date By Which Airline Companies Must File With The Department Of Revenue For Ad Valorem Tax Assessment Purposes Schedules Of Aircraft Operated In This State By Such Companies; To Revise The Length Of Time That Assessments Made By The Department Of Revenue Of Such Aircraft Shall Remain Open For Objection; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ad valorem tax; revise certain provisions relating to assessment of public service corporations.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-10 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-25 Approved by Governor
2020-06-18SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-18HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2020-06-11SenateReturned For Enrolling
2020-06-10SenatePassed
2020-06-04SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-05-11SenateReferred To Finance
2020-03-10HouseTransmitted To Senate
2020-03-09HousePassed
2020-03-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2020-02-14HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback