MS HB863 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 4 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-04 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 55-3-33, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Department Of Wildlife, Fisheries And Parks To Establish An Annual Golf Pass For Mississippi Residents For Play On Golf Courses At State Parks Operated By The Department; To Amend Section 55-3-41, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Establish The Mississippi State Parks Golf Fund For The Purpose Of Generating A Revenue Stream To Be Used Exclusively For The Operation, Maintenance And Upkeep Of State Park Golf Course; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dept. of Wildlife; authorize to establish annual golf pass for MS residents to play golf at state parks at discounted rates.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 115 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-03-04SenateDied In Committee
2014-02-14SenateReferred To Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2014-02-07HouseTransmitted To Senate
2014-02-06HousePassed
2014-01-30HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2014-01-20HouseReferred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback