MS HB859 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-08 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 57-1-55, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize The Mississippi Development Authority To Sell, Lease, Foreclose Or Otherwise Dispose Of A Project Or Any Property Related To A Project And To Pay Certain Costs Related To Such Disposal; To Amend Section 29-1-1, Mississippi Code Of 1972, In Conformity Thereto; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Development Authority; authorize to dispose of projects and pay certain costs related to such disposal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-30 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-08 | House | Died In Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Recommitted to Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Reconsidered |
2017-01-31 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Powell, Smith, Lamar) |
2017-01-30 | House | Passed |
2017-01-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2017-01-13 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |