MS HB859 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-17 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Create A Study Committee On Entertainment Industry Investment, For The Purpose Of Studying And Making Legislative Recommendations Regarding The Feasibility Of Creating New State And Local Incentives To Attract Economic Investment In The State By All Sectors Of The Entertainment Industry, Including Film, Television, Video, Music, Interactive Games, And Related Technologies And Services; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Tourism; create study committee on entertainment industry investment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-06 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 119 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-17 | Approved by Governor | |
2014-03-11 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-11 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Returned For Enrolling |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Passed |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass |
2014-03-04 | Senate | DR - TSDP: TO To RU |
2014-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Tourism;Rules |
2014-02-11 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2014-02-06 | House | Passed As Amended |
2014-02-06 | House | Amended |
2014-02-06 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2014-01-29 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2014-01-20 | House | Referred To Tourism |