MS HB848 | 2015 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 30 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-30 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 55-24-3, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Membership And Terms Of The Mississippi Coast Coliseum Commission; To Amend Section 55-24-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform To The Preceding Section; To Amend Sections 55-24-9 And 55-24-17, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Powers And Duties Of The Mississippi Coast Coliseum Commission And Require That Certain Actions Be Approved By The Harrison County Board Of Supervisors; To Require The Commission To Transfer $7,000,000.00 From The Coliseum Trust Fund To A Special County Account To Be Used Exclusively For Capital Improvements To The Coliseum; To Bring Forward Section 55-24-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, For The Purpose Of Possible Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Coast Coliseum Commission; revise membership and transfer trust fund money for certain purposes.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-03-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-03-30HouseDied In Conference
2015-03-30SenateConferees Named Clarke,Gollott,Burton
2015-03-23HouseConferees Named Shows,Bennett,DeLano
2015-03-11HouseDecline to Concur/Invite Conf
2015-03-05SenateReturned For Concurrence
2015-03-04SenatePassed As Amended
2015-03-04SenateAmended
2015-03-03SenateTitle Suff Do Pass As Amended
2015-02-17SenateReferred To Appropriations
2015-02-06HouseTransmitted To Senate
2015-02-05HousePassed
2015-02-05HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2015-02-03HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2015-01-19HouseReferred To County Affairs

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback