MS HB848 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-5-25, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The State Assent To Federal Aid Legislation To Ensure The Conservation Of Fish And Wildlife; To Provide That Revenue From Hunting And Fishing License Sales Shall Be Under The Exclusive Control Of The State Fish And Wildlife Agency For The Sole Use Of The Administration Of The Agency; To Repeal Section 49-5-27, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides The State Of Mississippi's Assent To The Provisions Of Fish Restoration And Management Projects Act; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State assent; revise to conform to federal aid legislation to ensure conservation of fish and wildlife.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-04-05 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-04-18 Approved by Governor
2012-04-12 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-11 Enrolled Bill Signed
2012-04-09 Transmitted To House
2012-04-05 Passed
2012-04-03 Title Suff Do Pass
2012-03-29 DR - TSDP: WI To FI
2012-03-16 Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks;Finance
2012-03-09 Transmitted To Senate
2012-03-08 Passed
2012-03-08 Committee Substitute Adopted
2012-02-28 Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2012-02-27 DR - TSDPCS: WM To WI
2012-02-23 DR - TSDPCS: WI To WM
2012-02-20 Referred To Wildlife, Fisheries and Parks;Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback