MS HB838 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Failed on July 10 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-10 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-1-19, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require The Department Of Public Safety To Promulgate Rules That Allow An Official Identifying Document Issued By The Mississippi Department Of Corrections To Serve As An Identifying Document Under This Section In Lieu Of A Birth Certificate Or Social Security Card For Any Person Released From The Custody Of The Mississippi Department Of Corrections In The Last Twelve Months; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Driver's license; require Department of Public Safety to allow official identifying document of MDOC to suffice for.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-10 | House | Died On Calendar |
2020-06-18 | Senate | Conferees Named Fillingane,Parks,Boyd |
2020-06-18 | House | Conferees Named Bain,Busby,Burnett |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Amended |
2020-05-27 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Highways and Transportation |
2020-03-06 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Passed |
2020-02-26 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-26 | House | DR - TSDP: TR To JB |
2020-02-18 | House | DR - TSDP: JB To TR |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred To Judiciary B;Transportation |