MS HB836 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 43-21-605, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That When A Child Is Committed To The Oakley Youth Development Center By The Youth Court, The Child Shall Be In The Physical Custody Of Oakley Within Five Business Days Of The Committal; To Require Oakley Staff To Utilize The Mississippi Youth Court Information Delivery System (mycids) To Ascertain Information For A Child During The Admissions Process; To Revise The Minimum Age That A Child May Be Committed To Oakley Or Ordered To A Juvenile Detention Center; To Amend Section 9-21-9, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Conform With The Preceding Section; To Amend Section 43-21-203, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize Any Person Admitted To The Practice Of Law In Mississippi To Observe Youth Court Hearings As Long As The Person Signs An Oath Of Confidentiality; To Require The Mississippi Judicial College To Prepare The Oath For Youth Court; To Provide That In All Hearings In Youth Court, A Complete Record Of Evidence Shall Be Taken By Stenographic Reporting; To Amend Section 43-21-261, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Require Youth Courts To Provide To The Administrative Office Of Courts, On A Monthly Basis, Cumulative Data That Provides Certain Nonidentifying Information Pertaining To Cases In The Court; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oakley Youth Development Center; require to have physical custody of child within certain time frame when child ordered to.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-07 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-26SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division A
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-07HousePassed As Amended
2019-02-07HouseAmended
2019-02-07HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-01-29HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Youth and Family Affairs

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback