MS HB833 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Died In Conference
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 63-17-75, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Revise The Mississippi Motor Vehicle Commission Law To Prohibit Certain Direct Sales Activities By A Motor Vehicle Manufacturer, Factory Branch, Distributor, Distributor Branch Or Subsidiary Thereof; To Amend Section 63-17-109, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify What The Mississippi Motor Vehicle Commission Law Does Not Prohibit Regarding A Motor Vehicle Manufacturer, Factory Branch, Distributor, Distributor Branch Or Subsidiary Thereof; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Mississippi Motor Vehicle Commission Law; prohibit direct sales by manufacturers except as provided.
Sponsors
Rep. John Lamar [R] | Rep. Otis Anthony [D] | Rep. Mark Tullos [R] | Rep. De Stamps [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 47 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed As Amended (Y: 113 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Passed (Y: 114 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Died In Conference |
2022-03-30 | House | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Recommitted For Further Conf |
2022-03-29 | Suspend from Deadlines by HC 89 | |
2022-03-28 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,England,Sparks |
2022-03-24 | Senate | Conferees Named Harkins,England,Younger |
2022-03-22 | House | Conferees Named Lamar,Barnett,Massengill |
2022-03-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2022-03-10 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Amended |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Referred To Finance |
2022-02-07 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed As Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Amended |
2022-02-03 | House | Reconsidered |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Reconsider Entered (Lamar, Steverson) |
2022-02-03 | House | Passed |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Substitute Adopted |
2022-02-01 | House | Title Suff Do Pass Comm Sub |
2022-01-17 | House | Referred To Ways and Means |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
63 | 17 | 109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 17 | 75 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |