MS HB833 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Due From Governor 04/24/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on April 18 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Due From Governor 04/24/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Sections 43-1-1 Through 43-1-5 And 43-27-20, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Automatic Repealer On The Statutes Which Establish The Mississippi Department Of Human Services And Provide For The Division Of Community Services In The Department Of Human Services; To Specify Certain Offices Within The Department Of Human Services; To Prescribe The Content Of Annual Reports By The Department Of Human Services; To Amend Sections 43-1-55 And 43-27-107, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Extend The Date Of The Repealers On The Duty Of The Department Of Human Services To Establish Employment Standards For Family Protection Specialists And Family Protection Workers; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Division of Community Services within Department of Youth Services; extend repealer on.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Formby [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-04-13 - House - House Concurred in Amend From Senate (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-04 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-08 - House - House Passed (Y: 121 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Due From Governor 04/24/12 | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-18 | Enrolled Bill Signed | |
2012-04-13 | Concurred in Amend From Senate | |
2012-04-09 | Returned For Concurrence | |
2012-04-04 | Passed As Amended | |
2012-04-04 | Amended | |
2012-03-29 | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended | |
2012-03-27 | DR - TSDPAA: PH To AP | |
2012-03-15 | Referred To Public Health and Welfare;Appropriations | |
2012-03-09 | Transmitted To Senate | |
2012-03-08 | Passed | |
2012-02-29 | Title Suff Do Pass | |
2012-02-20 | Referred To Youth and Family Affairs |