MS HB828 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-22 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Authorize The Mississippi Department Of Finance And Administration To Convey And Transfer, Without Compensation, Certain State-owned Real Property And Improvements Located In The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi, To The Mississippi Department Of Corrections; To Amend Chapter 514, General Laws Of 1983, To Authorize The Bureau Of Building, Grounds And Real Property Management To Lease Certain Land To The Mississippi Federation Of Women's Clubs, Incorporated, For A Period Not To Exceed Fifteen Years; To Authorize The Bureau Of Building, Grounds And Real Property Management To Release An Easement Along Certain Real Property Located In The City Of Jackson, Hinds County, Mississippi; To Authorize The Executive Director Of The Mississippi Department Of Transportation, On Behalf Of The Mississippi Transportation Commission, To Transfer And Convey By Mode Of Donation, Certain Real Property Located Within Holmes And Attala Counties, Mississippi, To The North Central Mississippi Regional Railroad Authority; And For Related Purposes.
Title
DFA; authorize to transfer certain state-owned real property in Jackson, Mississippi, to MDOC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 117 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - House - House Passed (Y: 120 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-22 | Approved by Governor | |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-04-08 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-31 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2015-03-29 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-29 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Conferees Named Blount,Doty,Harkins |
2015-03-23 | House | Conferees Named Weathersby,Sullivan,Mettetal |
2015-03-19 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Amended |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Referred To Public Property |
2015-01-30 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2015-01-29 | House | Passed |
2015-01-27 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2015-01-19 | House | Referred To Public Property |