MS HB824 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-08 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
An Act To Amend Section 23-15-153, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize A Per Diem In The Amount Of $150.00 To Election Commissioners For The Performance Of Their Duties On The Day Of Any Primary Or Runoff Election In Addition To Any General Or Special Election And To Authorize An Additional Per Diem For Election Commissioners For Any Election Occurring From July 1, 2020, Through December 31, 2020, Which Shall Be Additional Pandemic Pay; To Amend Sections 23-15-227 And 23-15-229, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Authorize An Additional Per Diem For County And Municipal Poll Managers For Any Election Occurring From July 1, 2020, Through December 31, 2020, Which Shall Be Additional Pandemic Pay And To Authorize The Secretary Of State To Promulgate Necessary Regulations To Ensure The Safety Of Poll Workers And Electors During A Covid-19 Emergency; And For Related Purposes.
Title
Election commissioners; authorize per diem for primary and runoff election days and provide for pandemic pay for election commissioners and poll managers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Conference Report Adopted (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-28 - House - House Conference Report Adopted (Y: 114 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Passed As Amended (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Passed (Y: 112 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-07-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-07-01 | House | Enrolled Bill Signed |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-28 | House | Conference Report Adopted |
2020-06-27 | House | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-27 | Senate | Conference Report Filed |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Conferees Named Branning,Tate,Blackwell |
2020-06-22 | House | Conferees Named Beckett,Eubanks,Reynolds |
2020-06-17 | House | Decline to Concur/Invite Conf |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Returned For Concurrence |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Passed As Amended |
2020-06-15 | Senate | Amended |
2020-06-08 | Senate | Title Suff Do Pass As Amended |
2020-05-11 | Senate | Referred To Elections |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmitted To Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Title Suff Do Pass |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred To Apportionment and Elections |