MS HB816 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Failed on March 5 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Create The Mississippi Educational Talent Recruitment Act; To Provide For A Rebate Program In Which An Individual Who Is A Recent Graduate Of A College Or University In Mississippi Or Outside Mississippi, And Is A Resident Of This State Employed In A Qualifying Job In This State May Participate And Receive A Rebate In An Amount Equal To All Or A Portion Of The Amount Of The Individual's State Income Tax Liability For A Five-year Period In Which The Individual Participates In The Program; To Define Certain Terms Used In This Act; To Amend Section 27-7-18, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Provide That A Rebate Received Under This Act Is Deductible As An Adjustment To Gross Income For State Income Tax Purposes; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Educational Talent Recruitment Act; create.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 111 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2019-02-20SenateReferred To Finance
2019-02-08HouseTransmitted To Senate
2019-02-06HousePassed
2019-02-06HouseCommittee Substitute Adopted
2019-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass Comm Sub
2019-01-21HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback