MS HB813 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-19 - Approved by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Section 49-17-403, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Include Certain Underground Storage Tanks Within The Definition Of An Active Site Under The Mississippi Underground Storage Tank Act Of 1988; To Amend Section 49-17-421, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Increase The Cap On The Annual Tank Regulatory Fee Assessed By The Commission On Environmental Quality; To Require That The Commission Set The Amount Of The Fee By Order; To Establish Certain Requirements For The Order Determining The Fee; To Authorize A Public Hearing To Be Held Regarding The Fee; To Create New Section 49-17-422, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Create The Underground Storage Tank Advisory Council; To Require The Council To Conduct An Independent Study Of The Costs Related To The Underground Storage Tank Program; To Require That The Council Recommend An Equitable Fee System For The Program; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mississippi Underground Storage Tank Act of 1988; revise tank regulatory fee provisions and create the Underground Storage Tank Advisory Council.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate Passed (Y: 50 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-06 - House - House Passed (Y: 88 N: 25 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-19 Approved by Governor
2018-03-12SenateEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-09HouseEnrolled Bill Signed
2018-03-07SenateReturned For Enrolling
2018-03-06SenatePassed
2018-02-21SenateTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-02-12SenateReferred To Energy
2018-02-07HouseTransmitted To Senate
2018-02-06HousePassed
2018-01-31HouseTabled Subject To Call
2018-01-25HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2018-01-11HouseReferred To Ways and Means

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback