MS HB813 | 2013 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 5 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-05 - Died In Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Bring Forward Section 99-19-73, Mississippi Code Of 1972, Which Provides For Various Assessments On Criminal Law Violations, For Amendment; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State assessments; bring forward code section for amendments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2013-02-14 - House - House Passed (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-03-05SenateDied In Committee
2013-02-27SenateDR - TSDPAA: JB To AC
2013-02-19SenateReferred To Judiciary, Division B;Accountability, Efficiency, Transparency
2013-02-15HouseTransmitted To Senate
2013-02-14HousePassed
2013-02-12HouseRead the Third Time
2013-02-05HouseTitle Suff Do Pass
2013-01-21HouseReferred To Appropriations

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback