MS HB813 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 15 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-15 - Died On Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

An Act To Amend Sections 73-65-1, 73-65-3, 73-65-5 And 73-65-7, Mississippi Code Of 1972, To Clarify Standards Established By The National Organization That Provides Credentialing And Educational Requirements For Licensed Professional Art Therapists, To Delete Certain Statutory Educational Requirements For Professional Art Therapists And To Delete Certain Grandfather Provisions No Longer Applicable To Licensure Of Art Therapists; And For Related Purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional Art Therapists; update educational qualifications for licensure.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-15 Died On Calendar
2012-03-08 Read the Third Time
2012-03-01 Title Suff Do Pass
2012-02-20 Referred To Public Health and Human Services

Mississippi State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback